Global Patent Index - EP 0924728 A3

EP 0924728 A3 2001-03-28 - High-voltage circuit breaker for high currents

Title (en)

High-voltage circuit breaker for high currents

Title (de)

Hoghspannungsschalter für hohen Nennstrom

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur à haute tension à courant nominal élevé

Publication

EP 0924728 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98204267 A

Priority

IT MI972795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924728A2] A circuit breaker for high-voltage currents comprising a vertical rod-like insulator (4) and at least one contact chamber arranged inside the insulator and containing fixed contacts (1) and movable contacts (2); the movable contacts (2) are connected to actuation means (5) for opening and closing the circuit breaker; the circuit breaker further comprises first and second elastic means (6,7), for opening and for closure respectively, which are made of insulating material and are arranged inside the insulator, and means (19,20,31,34,35,36) for actuating the circuit breaker which are coupled to the base of the insulator. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/42; H01H 33/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924728 A2 19990623; EP 0924728 A3 20010328; EP 0924728 B1 20070124; DE 69836952 D1 20070315; DE 69836952 T2 20071108; IT 1296880 B1 19990802; IT MI972795 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071216

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071216

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070124

2008-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071025

2007-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69836952 P 20070315

2007-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-01-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-01-24 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070124

2007-01-24 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070124

2007-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB POWER TECHNOLOGIES S.P.A.

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB TRASMISSIONE & DISTRIBUZIONE SPA

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 33/42 A, 7H 01H 33/40 B

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI