Global Patent Index - EP 0924733 A3

EP 0924733 A3 2000-05-24 - Sub-miniature fuse

Title (en)

Sub-miniature fuse

Title (de)

Mikrosicherung

Title (fr)

Micro fusible

Publication

EP 0924733 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121442 A

Priority

DE 19757024 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19757024C1] The micro-fuse has at least 2 planar linear actuators (1,2) provided by meandering structures (3,4 ; 5,6) acting as setting elements within the electrical current circuit, each with a fixed end (7) and a movable working end (8) and made of an electrically conductive shape memory alloy foil. The working ends of the actuators move in opposite directions and are coupled via a coupling piece (9) supporting a switch contact (10) which is opened and closed via respective actuators.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/14; H01H 1/52; H01H 61/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 61/01 (2006.01); H01H 71/14 (2006.01); H01H 1/00 (2006.01); H01H 1/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/145 (2013.01); H01H 61/0107 (2013.01); H01H 1/0036 (2013.01); H01H 1/52 (2013.01); H01H 2001/0047 (2013.01); H01H 2061/006 (2013.01); H01H 2061/0122 (2013.01); H01H 2083/206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19757024 C1 19990602; EP 0924733 A2 19990623; EP 0924733 A3 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041113

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI