Global Patent Index - EP 0924799 A3

EP 0924799 A3 2000-08-16 - Apparatus for wiring connection places of components of electrical devices or installations

Title (en)

Apparatus for wiring connection places of components of electrical devices or installations

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verdrahten von Anschlussstellen von Komponenten elektrischer Geräte oder Anlagen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour câbler des places de raccordement des composants des appareils ou des installations électriques

Publication

EP 0924799 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120449 A

Priority

DE 19756751 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19756751C1] The apparatus has an opening for the stripped end of a wire, dispenses an adjustable length of wire, and inserts the end into a contact. The contact includes a bow-shaped clamp contact spring (13) which is tensioned open by an opening tool on the wiring head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 43/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4827 (2013.01); H01R 43/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756751 C1 19990429; EP 0924799 A2 19990623; EP 0924799 A3 20000816; EP 0924799 B1 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808616

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051029

2005-10-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051029

2005-10-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051029

2004-10-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041025

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041015

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-12-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808616 P 20030710

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BJB GMBH & CO. KG

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WAGO KONTAKTTECHNIK GMBH

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI