Global Patent Index - EP 0924810 A3

EP 0924810 A3 2002-09-25 - Coaxial antenna connector for mobile phone

Title (en)

Coaxial antenna connector for mobile phone

Title (de)

Koaxialantenneverbinder für ein Mobiltelefon

Title (fr)

Connecteur d' antenne coaxiale pour un téléphone portable

Publication

EP 0924810 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98123641 A

Priority

  • EP 98123641 A
  • EP 97122616 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924810A2] A mobile phone coaxial connector assembly (2) comprises a switching coaxial connector (4) for connection to an external antenna, and a second coaxial connector (6) for connection to an internal antenna (70). The switching connector (4) and internal antenna connector (6) are provided with a common dielectric housing (8) such that the connectors form a single assembly. The internal antenna connector comprises a resiliently mounted center contact (58) having a large dome-shaped contact surface (68) for positional tolerance absorption. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/646

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/646 (2011.01); H01R 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/50 (2013.01); H01R 24/46 (2013.01); H01R 13/24 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01); H01R 2201/02 (2013.01); H01R 2201/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 4286335 A 19810825 - EICHLER JAY H, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924810 A2 19990623; EP 0924810 A3 20020925; EP 0924810 B1 20040407

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071210

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071211

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071210

2008-08-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071210

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2007-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69822989 P 20040513

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI SE

2004-04-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI SE

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/646 A

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI