Global Patent Index - EP 0924999 B1

EP 0924999 B1 2001-12-05 - INFLATABLE INSULATION

Title (en)

INFLATABLE INSULATION

Title (de)

AUFBLASBARE ISOLIERUNG

Title (fr)

MODULE D'ISOLATION GONFLABLE

Publication

EP 0924999 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97940243 A

Priority

  • GB 9702468 W
  • GB 9619123 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9810669A1] An inflatable insulation module(s) for an insulated garment comprises an inner and an outer membrane (4) sealed together to form an inflatable cavity. The membrane is formed of a water-vapour-permeable material which is breathable to allow escape of moisture from the wearer, and is air-impermeable to allow inflation of the module. The insulation value may be varied by varying the extent of inflation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/002 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/002 (2013.01); A41D 2400/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9810669 A1 19980319; AT 209866 T 20011215; AT A908897 A 20030115; AU 4214997 A 19980402; DE 19782215 T1 19991125; DE 29723798 U1 19990624; DE 69708889 D1 20020117; DE 69708889 T2 20020822; EP 0924999 A1 19990630; EP 0924999 B1 20011205; ES 2167790 T3 20020516; GB 9619123 D0 19961023; HK 1006919 A1 20001215

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050915

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030916

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030915

2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-09-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030916

2003-09-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030916

2003-09-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030915

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020930

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020911

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020820

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167790 T3

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708889 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209866 T 20011215

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES (UK) LTD.

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991215

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990324

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE