Global Patent Index - EP 0925071 A4

EP 0925071 A4 2000-09-13 - MUC-1 AS AN IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVE THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY AND AUTOIMMUNE CONDITIONS

Title (en)

MUC-1 AS AN IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVE THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY AND AUTOIMMUNE CONDITIONS

Title (de)

THERAPEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DIE, ENTWEDER EINZELN ODER KOMBINIERT, EIN ANTISERUM GEGEN GIFT ENTHALTEN ZUR THERAPEUTISCHEN VORBEUGUNG UND THERAPIE VON NEOPLASMEN

Title (fr)

LE MUC-1, AGENT THERAPEUTIQUE IMMUNOSUPPRESSEUR TRAITANT LES ETATS INFLAMMATOIRES ET AUTO-IMMUNITAIRES

Publication

EP 0925071 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97940948 A

Priority

  • US 9715928 W
  • US 2571896 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9810783A1] The invention relates to novel methods of treatment and pharmaceutical compositions comprising the mucin MUC-1 and its derivatives. Preferred MUC-1 derivatives comprise multiple tandem repeats of the MUC-1 core sequence. In fact, the figure shows that lower serum MUC-1 levels correlate with longer survival time. The disclosed compositions and methods are particularly useful in treating autoimmune disorders, inflammatory disorders, organ transplant rejection and graft versus host disease.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/16; A61K 38/17; A61P 37/06; C07K 14/47

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 5/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 21/04 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/1709 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9817300 A1 19980430 - DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]
  • [X] REDDISH MARK A ET AL: "Pre-immunotherapy serum CA27.29 (MUC-1) mucin level and CD69+ lymphocytes correlate with effects of Theratope sialyl-Tn-KLH cancer vaccine in active specific immunotherapy.", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY IMMUNOTHERAPY, vol. 42, no. 5, 1996, pages 303 - 309, XP000914873, ISSN: 0340-7004
  • [X] AGRAWAL B ET AL: "In vitro induction of MUC-1 peptide-specific type 1 T lymphocyte and cytotoxic T lymphocyte responses from healthy multiparous donors", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY,US,THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, vol. 157, no. 5, 1 September 1996 (1996-09-01), pages 2089 - 2095, XP002078857, ISSN: 0022-1767
  • [A] VAN DE WIEL-VAN KEMENADE ELLY ET AL: "Episialin (MUC1) inhibits cytotoxic lymphocyte-target cell interaction.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 151, no. 2, 1993, pages 767 - 776, XP002141253, ISSN: 0022-1767
  • See also references of WO 9810783A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9810783 A1 19980319; AU 4261397 A 19980402; AU 741258 B2 20011129; CA 2264748 A1 19980319; EP 0925071 A1 19990630; EP 0925071 A4 20000913; JP 2001501599 A 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030621

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020314

2000-09-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 38/16 A, 7A 61K 38/17 B, 7A 61P 37/06 B, 7C 07K 14/47 B

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990401

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE