Global Patent Index - EP 0925099 B1

EP 0925099 B1 2001-12-05 - STICK HANDLE WITH WRIST STRAP

Title (en)

STICK HANDLE WITH WRIST STRAP

Title (de)

STOCKGRIFF MIT HANDSCHLAUFE

Title (fr)

POIGNEE DE BATON AVEC DRAGONNE

Publication

EP 0925099 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97944857 A

Priority

  • DE 19636852 A
  • EP 9704900 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6264242B1] A handle for ski sticks and the like provided with a wrist strap. The wrist strap is attached to the stick handle by a first connecting element fixed at the wrist strap and a second connecting element lodged at the ski's stick handle, which are interlocked. To insure that the connection between the stick handle and the wrist strap is disengaged automatically only in case of danger and no inopportune releasing occurs, a flexible releasing device is installed, which holds one of the connecting elements at the interlocked position and yields only when the wrist strap is pulled in the same direction, a direction with a force component running longitudinally in the stick from its tip toward the handle, so that the second connecting element held together by the releasing device can be disengaged from its interlocked position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 11/22; A45B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 9/02 (2006.01); A63C 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/222 (2013.01); A45B 9/02 (2013.01); A45B 2009/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 6264242 B1 20010724; AT 209945 T 20011215; CA 2264888 A1 19980319; DE 19636852 C1 19980212; EP 0925099 A1 19990630; EP 0925099 B1 20011205; JP 2001502931 A 20010306; JP 2007229492 A 20070913; JP 3993897 B2 20071017; JP 4612652 B2 20110112; WO 9810844 A1 19980319

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 209945 T

- Effective date: 20170909

2017-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-09-09 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705688

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: LEKOSPORT AG, CH

- Document: AT 209945 T

- Effective date: 20140303

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEKISPORT AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LENHART, KLAUS, 73275 OHMDEN, DE

- Document: DE 59705688

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-10-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59705688

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-10-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59705688

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-09-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: LEKISPORT AG, CH

- Effective date: 20130806

2013-09-06 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: LEKISPORT AG, CH

- Effective date: 20130806

2013-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LEKISPORT AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LENHART, KLAUS, DE

2008-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2007-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705688 20020117

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209945 T 20011215

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010404

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980905

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI