Global Patent Index - EP 0925155 B1

EP 0925155 B1 2000-09-13 - TORQUE WRENCH

Title (en)

TORQUE WRENCH

Title (de)

DREHMOMENTSCHLÜSSEL

Title (fr)

CLE DYNAMOMETRIQUE

Publication

EP 0925155 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97932810 A

Priority

  • DE 19637067 A
  • EP 9703696 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19637067A1] The invention concerns a torque wrench provided with an electronic evaluation device for values measured by sensors in order to detect the torque and an angle of rotation. According to the invention, in order to improve the transmission technology for determining the angle of rotation, a sensor takes the form of an acceleration sensor (9) for detecting the acceleration of the angle of rotation ( alpha ) whose measured values are chronologically integrated twice by the evaluation device (5) in order to determine the angle of rotation ( alpha ).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/14 (2006.01); B25B 23/144 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19637067 A1 19980319; AU 3622497 A 19980511; EP 0925155 A1 19990630; EP 0925155 B1 20000913; ES 2150784 T3 20001201; US 6167788 B1 20010102; WO 9810901 A1 19980319

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040712

2005-07-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040711

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-07-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-07-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040711

2003-07-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030701

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-11 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030611

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030610

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030609

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030604

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150784 T3

2000-11-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702356 20001019

2000-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991228

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990122

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE