Global Patent Index - EP 0925188 B1

EP 0925188 B1 2000-06-28 - METHOD AND DEVICE TO CONTROL AN ENGRAVING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE TO CONTROL AN ENGRAVING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES GRAVIERORGANS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE GRAVAGE

Publication

EP 0925188 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97937448 A

Priority

  • DE 9701721 W
  • DE 19635831 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19635831A1] The invention relates to a method to control an engraving device for the engraving of printing forms by means of an engraving tool (2) controlled by a driving system (4,5). Set engraving depth values for the cups along with engraving signal values are produced from engraving data as a control signal for the driving system (4,5). The working strokes of the engraving tool (2) and the distances (A) between the printing form (3) and the engraving tool (2) are measured and the actual values of the engraving depth are determined from the differences and compared to the set engraving depth values. The control signal for the driving system (4,5) is turned on at the beginning of engraving of the cup and turned off when the engraving depth is reached at the end of engraving of the cup. Set values for pressure force and tractive force are also obtained from the engraving data and compared to the actual pressure force values applied to the engraving tool (2) and the actual tractive force values applied to the return element (9) of the engraving tool (2). Exceeded set values are indicated. The control signal is corrected according to pressure force and tractive force measurement in order to allow for differing hardnesses of material of the printing Form (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/045

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/045 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19635831 A1 19980305; DE 59701948 D1 20000803; EP 0925188 A1 19990630; EP 0925188 B1 20000628; JP 2000502628 A 20000307; JP 3335642 B2 20021021; US 6421576 B1 20020716; WO 9809817 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090909

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100812

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701948

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100812

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100812

2011-03-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090819

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090831

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090826

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-07-27 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2004-07-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-02-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: HELL GRAVURE SYSTEMS GMBH

2003-12-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701948 20000803

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991029

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990406

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL