Global Patent Index - EP 0925190 B1

EP 0925190 B1 2002-09-04 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DUSTING SMOOTH OR SHEET-LIKE PRODUCTS

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DUSTING SMOOTH OR SHEET-LIKE PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESTÄUBEN BAHN- ODER BLATTFÖRMIGER PRODUKTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE SAUPOUDRAGE DE PRODUITS A SURFACE LISSE OU EN FORME DE FEUILLE

Publication

EP 0925190 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97937575 A

Priority

  • DE 19635830 A
  • EP 9704394 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19635830A1] The present invention relates to a device and method for dusting smooth or sheet-like products (20), comprising at least one duster (16) for spraying on said products an air/powder mixture. In order to ensure efficient dusting with no dirt accumulation in the printer or the surrounding area, it is suggested that part of the powder particles be magnetized and means provided (22) for creating in the powder deposit area (24) a magnetic field (23) so that said powder particles are submitted to a force driving them towards the product (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/06; B05B 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/00 (2006.01); B05B 5/08 (2006.01); B05B 17/04 (2006.01); B05D 1/02 (2006.01); B05D 1/12 (2006.01); B41F 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/00 (2013.01); B05B 17/04 (2013.01); B05D 1/12 (2013.01); B41F 23/06 (2013.01); Y10S 430/102 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19635830 A1 19980305; AT 223311 T 20020915; EP 0925190 A1 19990630; EP 0925190 B1 20020904; JP 2000517259 A 20001226; US 6447855 B1 20020910; WO 9809818 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708137

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-08-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050813

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030813

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WEITMANN & KONRAD G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-08-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0925190E

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708137 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223311 T 20020915

2001-07-04 [18RR] RIGHTS RE-ESTABLISHED BEFORE GRANT

- Free text: 20010518 ANGENOMMEN

2001-05-02 [18RA] RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Effective date: 20010305

2000-10-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000502

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990929

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980805

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE