Global Patent Index - EP 0925196 B1

EP 0925196 B1 2000-11-15 - METHOD TO PRODUCE A FABRIC STRIP, ESPECIALLY FOR A SCREEN PRINTING FORM, AND FABRIC, ESPECIALLY SCREEN PRINTING FABRIC

Title (en)

METHOD TO PRODUCE A FABRIC STRIP, ESPECIALLY FOR A SCREEN PRINTING FORM, AND FABRIC, ESPECIALLY SCREEN PRINTING FABRIC

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER GEWEBEBAHN, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE SIEBDRUCKFORM, SOWIE GEWEBE, INSBESONDERE SIEBDRUCKGEWEBE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE BANDE DE TISSU, NOTAMMENT POUR UNE FORME DE SERIGRAPHIE, AINSI QUE TISSU NOTAMMENT TISSU DE SERIGRAPHIE

Publication

EP 0925196 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97941985 A

Priority

  • DE 19637267 A
  • EP 9704844 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9810940A1] The invention relates to a method to produce a fabric strip, especially for use as a screen printing template made from plastic fabric, which is vacuum metallized with an encasing layer and is then given an electroplated coating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41N 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 1/247 (2013.01); C25D 7/0614 (2013.01); Y10T 442/259 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3398 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3415 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9810940 A1 19980319; AT 197575 T 20001215; AU 4382697 A 19980402; BR 9712045 A 19990824; CA 2265677 A1 19980319; CN 1230148 A 19990929; CZ 9900807 A3 19990714; DE 19738872 A1 19980423; DE 19738874 A1 19980423; EP 0925196 A1 19990630; EP 0925196 B1 20001115; ES 2154471 T3 20010401; ID 18271 A 19980319; JP 2001500080 A 20010109; KR 20000036100 A 20000626; PT 925196 E 20010531; TW 424055 B 20010301; US 6284679 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050906

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-07-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2003-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020906

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SEFAR A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020930

2003-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020907

2002-09-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020906

2002-09-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020906

2002-09-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020906

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011116

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-10-03 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011003

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-01 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011001

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010924

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010924

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010921

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010921

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010827

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010823

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010212

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2154471

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HIEBSCH & PEEGE AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-03-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702649

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-21

2000-12-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197575

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991027

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990323

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT