Global Patent Index - EP 0925225 B1

EP 0925225 B1 2001-02-28 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PACKING POWDERY OR GRANULAR BULK MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PACKING POWDERY OR GRANULAR BULK MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERPACKEN PULVERIGER ODER KÖRNIGER SCHÜTTGÜTER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR EMBALLER UN MATERIAU EN VRAC EN POUDRE OU EN GRAINS

Publication

EP 0925225 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97929115 A

Priority

  • DE 9701259 W
  • DE 19637615 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19637615C1] Disclosed is a method for packing powdery or granular bulk material. In order to reduce packaging material the volume of packed bulk goods (1) is compacted in order to obtain a pressed part (2), whereby the enclosed air escapes and individual particles bond to each other. The pressed part (2) is introduced into a wrapper, such as a bag (3) which is then closed. The pressed part can have a cuboid, cylindrical, spherical or any other shape. It can present peripheral notches (9), subdividing it into several parts. The pressed part is pressed in the packaging on both sides so that particle bonding is destroyed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 63/02; B65B 61/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/02 (2006.01); B65B 1/24 (2006.01); B65B 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 63/02 (2013.01); B30B 11/02 (2013.01); B65B 1/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19637615 C1 19971002; EP 0925225 A1 19990630; EP 0925225 B1 20010228; ES 2155255 T3 20010501; WO 9812114 A1 19980326

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050619

2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030620

2004-08-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030619

2004-02-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030620

2003-06-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030620

2003-06-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030619

2002-06-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020622

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020611

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: REAKTIVIERUNG NACH IRRTUEMLICHER LOESCHUNG

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155255 T3

2001-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703070 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991008

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990416

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE