Global Patent Index - EP 0925239 B1

EP 0925239 B1 2000-04-19 - PACKAGING FOR FLAT LYING FOLDABLE BOX BLANKS

Title (en)

PACKAGING FOR FLAT LYING FOLDABLE BOX BLANKS

Title (de)

VERPACKUNG FÜR FLACHLIEGENDE FALTSCHACHTELZUSCHNITTE

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE POUR DECOUPES PLATES DE BOITES PLIANTES

Publication

EP 0925239 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97935466 A

Priority

  • DE 9701554 W
  • DE 29615205 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9809888A1] Packaging (10, 10a) for flat-lying foldable box blanks (1) having a sleeve-shaped surrounding wrapping (11, 11a) enclosed by shrink film. Several layers (23, 23a) of foldable box blanks (1) are placed inside the surrounding wrapping (11, 11a) and are respectively separated from each other by an intermediate bottom (25). In order to ensure fully automatic removal of the foldable box blanks (1) from the surrounding wrapping (11, 11a) the intermediate bottoms (25) are designed in a U shape in their longitudinal section so that the foldable box blanks (1) are surrounded by the intermediate bottoms (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/16; B65D 57/00; B65D 85/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29615205 U1 19980108; EP 0925239 A1 19990630; EP 0925239 B1 20000419; WO 9809888 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701482

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120927

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-07-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050723

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040723

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040723

2003-07-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030723

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701482 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990805

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990406

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI