Global Patent Index - EP 0925380 B1

EP 0925380 B1 2001-05-23 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SELF-HARDENING STEEL WIRE, REINFORCING WIRE AND APPLICATION TO A FLEXIBLE DUCT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SELF-HARDENING STEEL WIRE, REINFORCING WIRE AND APPLICATION TO A FLEXIBLE DUCT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DRÄHTEN AUS SELBSTAUSHÄRTENDEM STAHL, VON PROFILDRÄHTEN UND VERWENDUNG FÜR BIEGSAME RÖHRLEITUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE FILS EN ACIER AUTO-TREMPANT, FILS DE FORME ET APPLICATION A UNE CONDUITE FLEXIBLE

Publication

EP 0925380 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97940193 A

Priority

  • FR 9701578 W
  • FR 9610976 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2753206A1] The invention concerns a method for manufacturing steel wire comprising the following steps: manufacturing a reinforcing wire of sizeable length by rolling or hot wire drawing from steel containing the following elements: 0.18 % to 0.45 % of C, 0.4 % to 1.8 % of Mn, 1 to 4 % of Cr, 0.1 % to 0.6 % of Si, 0 to 1.5 % of Mo, 0 to 1.5 % of Ni, at most 0.01 % of S and 0.02 % of P, the reinforcing wire having after being rolled or hot drawn a temperature at least higher than the AC3 temperature, preferably between 50 and 200 DEG C and in particular 100 and 150 DEG C; winding the wire in reels before air cooling the raw manufacturing wire to obtain a HRC hardness not less than 40 and preferably higher than 45. In a variant, the method consists in quenching and tempering so that the wire has a hardness between 20 HRC and 35 HRC. The invention also concerns a reinforcing wire and a flexible tube for carrying effluent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/18; C21D 8/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/04 (2006.01); C21D 8/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/22 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/045 (2013.01); C21D 8/06 (2013.01); C21D 8/065 (2013.01); C22C 38/22 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12431 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12972 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2753206 A1 19980313; FR 2753206 B1 19981106; AU 4211897 A 19980326; AU 734607 B2 20010621; BR 9711717 A 19990824; CA 2265573 A1 19980312; DK 0925380 T3 20010806; EP 0925380 A1 19990630; EP 0925380 B1 20010523; JP 2000517381 A 20001226; NO 991119 A 19990507; NO 991119 D0 19990308; US 6291079 B1 20010918; WO 9810113 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120908

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-06-03 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120908

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110801

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110921

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-12-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2004-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE

2001-08-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB NL

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990809

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990409

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB NL