Global Patent Index - EP 0925387 B1

EP 0925387 B1 2000-09-20 - ANODE WITH ENHANCED DURABILITY AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

ANODE WITH ENHANCED DURABILITY AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

ANODE MIT VERBESSERTER LEBENSDAUER UND DEREN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

ANODE A LONGEVITE AMELIOREE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0925387 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97924074 A

Priority

  • FR 9700836 W
  • FR 9605916 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9743465A1] An anode with enhanced durability for use in electrochemical processes is disclosed. The anode consists of a substrate made of at least one metal compound and provided with an outer tantalum surface coated with an electrocatalytic iridium oxide coating, and has a standard lifetime, as measured in test A, longer than 14 h.m<2>.g<-1>, preferably longer than 20 h.m<2>.g<-1>, and more preferably longer than 25 h.m<2>.g<-1>.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25B 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25B 11/04 (2006.01); C25B 11/06 (2006.01); C25B 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25B 11/0447 (2013.01); C25B 11/0426 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9743465 A1 19971120; DE 69703163 D1 20001026; DE 69703163 T2 20010517; EP 0925387 A1 19990630; EP 0925387 B1 20000920; ES 2152673 T3 20010201; FR 2748495 A1 19971114; FR 2748495 B1 19980717

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2014-12-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141201

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130513

2014-06-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140610

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130512

2014-03-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69703163

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130512

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130512

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130412

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120615

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120514

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE SERVICE NATIONAL

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-06-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152673 T3

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703163 20001026

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REID, VERONIQUE

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LECLERC, OLIVIER

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MANOLI, GEORGIA

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CARDARELLI, FRANCOIS

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SAVALL, ANDRE

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COMNINELLIS, CHRISTOS

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAXIL, PIERRE

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991118

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981102

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL