Global Patent Index - EP 0925389 B1

EP 0925389 B1 2001-05-30 - PORE-FREE COATING OF METAL CONTAINERS

Title (en)

PORE-FREE COATING OF METAL CONTAINERS

Title (de)

PORENFREIE BESCHICHTUNG VON METALLBEHÄLTERN

Title (fr)

REVETEMENT SANS POROSITES DE RECIPIENTS METALLIQUES

Publication

EP 0925389 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97940152 A

Priority

  • DE 19635560 A
  • EP 9704764 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19635560A1] A process is disclosed for coating metal containers for foodstuffs and beverages. An electro-dipcoat is applied by electro-dipcoating on a ground coat which is applied by dip-painting or spray painting and is preferably pre-dried. The thus obtained coating is characterised by a reduced porosity which does not affect its specific paint weight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 13/20; C25D 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 13/12 (2006.01); C25D 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 13/12 (2013.01); C25D 13/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19635560 A1 19980305; AT 201726 T 20010615; BR 9711650 A 19990824; CA 2263092 A1 19980312; EP 0925389 A1 19990630; EP 0925389 B1 20010530; ES 2159147 T3 20010916; WO 9810124 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050902

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020902

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PPG INDUSTRIES OHIO INC.

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-09-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011009

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159147 T3

2001-09-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010914

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010902

2001-08-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-08-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010821

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010821

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010820

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010817

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703688 20010705

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201726 T 20010615

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990806

1999-07-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PPG INDUSTRIES OHIO, INC.

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990304

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE