Global Patent Index - EP 0925433 B1

EP 0925433 B1 2001-05-16 - AIR/FUEL MIXTURE CONTROL IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

AIR/FUEL MIXTURE CONTROL IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG DES KRAFTSTOFF-LUFT-VERHÄLTNISSES EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE REGLAGE DU MELANGE AIR/CARBURANT DANS UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0925433 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97928228 A

Priority

  • DE 19636465 A
  • EP 9703166 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9810183A1] The present invention relates to a method of controlling the air/fuel mixture in an internal combustion engine, wherein the output signal from a first Lambda probe located in the exhaust pipe upstream of a catalyst is carried to a controlling device which transmits a response output about the air/fuel mixture and then receives a correcting signal based on the output signal from the second Lambda probe situated downstream of the catalyst. In order to achieve such an accurate and adaptive control as to improve the air/fuel mixture in the sense of reducing gas emissions, the correcting signal is weighted in relation to the length of period of the output signal from the first Lambda probe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1487 (2013.01); F02D 41/1441 (2013.01); F02D 41/1474 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9810183 A1 19980312; BR 9713196 A 19991103; DE 19636465 C1 19980430; EP 0925433 A1 19990630; EP 0925433 B1 20010516; US 6209314 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040618

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040618

2003-08-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030818

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030627

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030611

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703562 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001012

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990119

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT