Global Patent Index - EP 0925434 B1

EP 0925434 B1 2002-11-27 - SYSTEM FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, IN PARTICULAR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, IN PARTICULAR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE INSBESONDERE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'EXPLOITATION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE, EN PARTICULIER D'UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 0925434 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934877 A

Priority

  • DE 9801565 W
  • DE 19729101 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19729101A1] An internal combustion engine fuel supply system (1) is disclosed, in particular for a motor vehicle. The fuel supply system (1) has a pump (4, 6) for pumping fuel into a reservoir (2) and for generating a pressure (preal) in the reservoir (2). A pressure sensor (9) measures a real value (Upreal) of the pressure (preal) in the reservoir (2) and a pressure-regulating valve (10) acts upon the pressure (preal) in the reservoir (2). A controller (11) is provided with means for setting the pressure in the reservoir (2) at a set value (Upset). The controller (11) is also provided with means which enable pressure regulation in the reservoir (2) to be replaced by a control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38; F02D 41/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3863 (2013.01); F02D 41/1488 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1416 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01); F02D 2250/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19729101 A1 19990114; EP 0925434 A1 19990630; EP 0925434 B1 20021127; JP 2001500219 A 20010109; JP 4082744 B2 20080430; KR 100696085 B1 20070320; KR 20000068451 A 20001125; US 6209521 B1 20010403; WO 9902837 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806437

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806437

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120229

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100609

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100609

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100706

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806437 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001121

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990721

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB