Global Patent Index - EP 0925470 A3

EP 0925470 A3 2002-11-27 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR BURNING FUEL IN AIR

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR BURNING FUEL IN AIR

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBRENNUNG EINES BRENNSTOFFS IN LUFT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LA COMBUSTION D'UN COMBUSTIBLE DANS L'AIR

Publication

EP 0925470 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97918906 A

Priority

  • DE 9701852 W
  • DE 19636556 A
  • DE 19640818 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9811383A2] A process and device are disclosed for burning fuel (6) in air. The device has a ring-shaped channel (4) for guiding air in a meridional stream (5) with respect to an axis (1), a swirl grid (9) for impressing a swirl (10) onto the stream (5) and means (11, 12, 16) for mixing fuel (6) into the stream (5) and forming a substantially homogeneous mixture. Also provided is a means (13, 17, 18) for slowing down a part of the stream (5) which is external in the radial direction from the axis (1) with respect to other parts of the stream (5). The device is in particular designed as a premixture burner, for use for example in a gas turbine installation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 5/00 (2006.01); F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23C 99/00 (2006.01); F23D 14/02 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01); F23L 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/02 (2013.01); F23C 7/004 (2013.01); F23C 2900/07001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9811383 A2 19980319; WO 9811383 A3 20021010; EP 0925470 A2 19990630; EP 0925470 A3 20021127; EP 0925470 B1 20000308; JP 2002513458 A 20020508; JP 4130475 B2 20080806; RU 2190804 C2 20021010; US 6152724 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140826

2015-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701235

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140826

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140826

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701235

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130827

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130814

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-05-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701235 20000413

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990804

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990305

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI