Global Patent Index - EP 0925472 B1

EP 0925472 B1 2001-04-04 - METHOD FOR THE SUPPRESSION OF COMBUSTION OSCILLATIONS AND DEVICE FOR COMBUSTION OF FUEL WITH AIR

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE SUPPRESSION OF COMBUSTION OSCILLATIONS AND DEVICE FOR COMBUSTION OF FUEL WITH AIR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON VERBRENNUNGSSCHWINGUNGEN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR VERBRENNUNG VON BRENNSTOFF MIT LUFT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA SUPPRESSION DES OSCILLATIONS DE COMBUSTION ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA COMBUSTION D'UN COMBUSTIBLE AVEC DE L'AIR

Publication

EP 0925472 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97941847 A

Priority

  • DE 9701881 W
  • DE 19637725 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9812478A1] The invention relates to a method and device for the combustion of fuel with air in a combustion chamber (5). Air is fed via at least one air inlet (6) and fuel is supplied by a plurality of burners (7). Each burner (7) presents an appropriate delay time corresponding to a period of time after which an acoustic impulse in the combustion chamber (5) causes a thermal impulse upon combustion of the fuel supplied via the burner (7). Fuel supply is controlled by the burners (7) so that burner delay times vary considerably. The invention can be used in a gas turbine combustion chamber (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23M 13/00; F23D 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/28 (2006.01); F23C 15/00 (2006.01); F23D 23/00 (2006.01); F23M 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 23/00 (2013.01); F23M 20/005 (2013.01); F23R 2900/00014 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9812478 A1 19980326; EP 0925472 A1 19990630; EP 0925472 B1 20010404; JP 2001503843 A 20010321; JP 4249263 B2 20090402; RU 2186298 C2 20020727; US 6052986 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161109

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010626

2001-07-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703302 20010510

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-08-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR THE SUPPRESSION OF COMBUSTION OSCILLATIONS AND DEVICE FOR COMBUSTION OF FUEL WITH AIR

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990827

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990305

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI