Global Patent Index - EP 0925480 B1

EP 0925480 B1 2001-12-05 - IGNITING/FIRING ELEMENT WITH AN IGNITING JUMPER ON A CHIP

Title (en)

IGNITING/FIRING ELEMENT WITH AN IGNITING JUMPER ON A CHIP

Title (de)

ZÜND-/ANZÜNDELEMENT MIT EINER AUF EINEM CHIP ANGEORDNETEN ZÜNDBRÜCKE

Title (fr)

ELEMENT D'AMORCAGE/ALLUMAGE AVEC UN CAVALIER D'ALLUMAGE INSTALLE SUR UNE PUCE ELECTRONIQUE

Publication

EP 0925480 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97944872 A

Priority

  • DE 19637587 A
  • EP 9704976 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19637587A1] The present invention relates to an igniting/firing element with a casing (1) receiving electrical junction lines connected to an igniting jumper (3) on a chip (2) provided with at least one igniting unit (4a, 4b). In order to allow for the invention to be universally used and to avoid uncontrolled discharge, it is suggested that the junction lines be designed in the form of pins, which are led to the casing (1) through a glass seal, and that the casing bottom (1) be a metal body (7) in which bores (8) are provided for said glass seals (6) to pass through, and that the metal body be positive-fit to the plastic body (9) covering the peripheral wall of the casing (1) and wrapping the pin tips (5) emerging from the glass seal (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/12 (2006.01); F42B 3/13 (2006.01); F42C 19/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/13 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19637587 A1 19980319; AT 210271 T 20011215; BR 9712821 A 19991123; CA 2265585 A1 19980319; CN 1080410 C 20020306; CN 1230252 A 19990929; CZ 298386 B6 20070919; CZ 9900868 A3 20010613; EP 0925480 A1 19990630; EP 0925480 B1 20011205; ES 2165093 T3 20020301; JP 2001500602 A 20010116; JP 4030130 B2 20080109; KR 100614121 B1 20060822; KR 20000036083 A 20000626; PL 183951 B1 20020830; PL 332160 A1 19990830; RU 2196292 C2 20030110; TR 199900564 T2 19990621; US 6262875 B1 20010717; WO 9811400 A1 19980319

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120912

2013-10-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131021

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120911

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120911

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120911

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111017

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110915

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110907

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-06-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165093 T3

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705692 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT SE

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210271 T 20011215

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991102

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990414

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT SE