Global Patent Index - EP 0925602 B1

EP 0925602 B1 2002-09-04 - LONG-LASTING METAL HALIDE DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (en)

LONG-LASTING METAL HALIDE DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (de)

METALLHALOGENID-ENTLADUNGSLAMPE MIT LANGER LEBENSDAUER

Title (fr)

LAMPE A DECHARGE AUX HALOGENURES DE METAL PRESENTANT UNE LONGUE DUREE DE VIE

Publication

EP 0925602 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98931952 A

Priority

  • DE 9801097 W
  • DE 19716462 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848446A2] The invention relates to an improved lamp filling for extending the life of a metal halide discharge lamp. The inventive lamp is particularly suitable for effect lighting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/20 (2006.01); H01J 61/12 (2006.01); H01J 61/88 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/12 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848446 A2 19981029; WO 9848446 A3 19990121; EP 0925602 A2 19990630; EP 0925602 B1 20020904; JP 2000512803 A 20000926; US 6218781 B1 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070420

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070420

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070420

2006-06-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060619

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-04 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060404

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021112

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805403 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010802

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981204

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL