Global Patent Index - EP 0925738 B1

EP 0925738 B1 2001-12-19 - Container for storing a product, especially for hair care, with regard to its application to a substrate

Title (en)

Container for storing a product, especially for hair care, with regard to its application to a substrate

Title (de)

Behältnis zum Aufbewahren eines Präparats, insbesondere zur Haarbehandlung, unter Berücksichtigung von dessen Aufbringen auf ein Objekt

Title (fr)

Recipient pour le conditionnement d'une composition notamment capillaire en vue de son application sur un support

Publication

EP 0925738 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402903 A

Priority

FR 9716172 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0925738A1] The container (20) is open at the top to allow the product to be taken on an applicator (1) and incorporates a scraper (32) with a curved edge (39) for removing surplus product from the applicator as it is withdrawn from the container along a sloping guide surface (30) The scraper is fitted in place over the top of the container prior to using the applicator and held by fixings (33, 34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 19/00 (2006.01); A45D 19/02 (2006.01); B44D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 19/00 (2013.01); B44D 3/128 (2013.01); A45D 19/02 (2013.01); A45D 2019/0091 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0925738 A1 19990630; EP 0925738 B1 20011219; CA 2255209 A1 19990619; DE 69803034 D1 20020131; DE 69803034 T2 20020502; ES 2170467 T3 20020801; FR 2772567 A1 19990625; FR 2772567 B1 20000218; US 6176389 B1 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041122

2005-11-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051120

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041120

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-11-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041122

2004-11-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041120

2003-12-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031119

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031110

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170467 T3

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803034 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010816

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DE LAFORCADE, VINCENT

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991230

2000-03-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-16 [DIN1] INVENTOR (DELETED)

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI