Global patent index - EP 0925746 A3

EP 0925746 A3 2000-05-31 - Cover layer intended for placing on the top of a water mattress

Title (en)

Cover layer intended for placing on the top of a water mattress

Title (de)

Dekschicht für eine Wassermatratze

Title (fr)

Couche de revêtement pour un matelas à eau

Publication

EP 0925746 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98204400 A

Priority

NL 1007893 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0925746A2] Described is a cover layer (1) intended for placing on the top of a water mattress (6). The cover layer (1) comprises at least an upper layer (2) of flexible material which substantially covers the upper surface of a water mattress (6) and which is provided with coupling means (5,9) for releasable coupling of the upper layer to the top side of a water mattress (6). The cover layer (1) is characterized in that the upper layer (2) is provided with a flexible edge construction whereby during use of the water mattress the upper layer (2) remains substantially in the original situation relative to the underlying water mattress (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/08; A47C 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/02 (2006.01); A47C 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/022 (2013.01); A47C 27/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0925746 A2 19990630; EP 0925746 A3 20000531; NL 1007893 C1 19990625

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021009

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI