Global Patent Index - EP 0925814 A3

EP 0925814 A3 2000-03-08 - Brake for rollerskates, particularly for in-line skate

Title (en)

Brake for rollerskates, particularly for in-line skate

Title (de)

Bremse für Rollschuhe, insbesondere einspurige Rollschuhe

Title (fr)

Frein pour patins à roulettes, particulièrement pour patins à roulettes alignées

Publication

EP 0925814 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98890370 A

Priority

AT 215197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0925814A2] The inline skate has an under-part (2) connected to a sole (12). An element is positioned in the under-part in the rear third of the sole, which is operated by the body weight of the user via the heel of the user's foot (7). It is connected to one or all brake elements (11). The element is a pedal (9), fastened to the sole via a return spring (10) etc. The pedal is connected to the brake elements directly or via a bracket, which is connected to the roller carrier (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/1427 (2013.01); A63C 17/1436 (2013.01); A63C 17/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0925814 A2 19990630; EP 0925814 A3 20000308; AT 405613 B 19991025; AT A215197 A 19990215

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-04-18 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: FANCYFORM DESIGN ENGINEERING ENTWICKLUNGS- UND VER

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI