Global Patent Index - EP 0925839 A3

EP 0925839 A3 2001-01-10 - Orbital applicator for tapered edge patterns of spray coatings

Title (en)

Orbital applicator for tapered edge patterns of spray coatings

Title (de)

Drehende Auftragsvorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Sprühbildes mit einem verjüngten Randbereich

Title (fr)

Applicateur rotatif pour produire, par pulvérisation, un revêtement à bord aminci

Publication

EP 0925839 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98310279 A

Priority

US 6959897 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0925839A2] An applicator for applying sealants and adhesives (usually robotically) utilizes an orbiting applicator (10) which has a wide angle spray tip (12) on the end. Use of the wide angle tip in conjunction with orbiting yields an even spray pattern having a nicely feathered edge which is desirable in certain types of applications. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/02 (2006.01); B05B 3/02 (2006.01); B05B 9/00 (2006.01); B05C 5/00 (2006.01); B05B 1/04 (2006.01); B05B 9/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/02 (2013.01); B05B 1/04 (2013.01); B05B 9/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0925839 A2 19990630; EP 0925839 A3 20010110; JP H11235544 A 19990831

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI