Global Patent Index - EP 0925850 A3

EP 0925850 A3 2002-12-04 - Method of rolling a metal strip

Title (en)

Method of rolling a metal strip

Title (de)

Walzverfahren für ein Metallband

Title (fr)

Procédé de laminage pour une bande métallique

Publication

EP 0925850 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124113 A

Priority

DE 19757486 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0925850A2] The strip (1) is first upset in an upsetting roll stand (8), so that the strip cross section has a bone like contour with thickened ends. The strip edge regions primarily are next rolled in a compensating roll stand (9). The strip is cut into lengths by shears (10) after the upsetting roll stand (8) or after the compensating roll stand (9). After this it is rolled in at least one roll stand (11) with working rolls (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/22; B21B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/22 (2006.01); B21B 15/00 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/224 (2013.01); B21B 15/0007 (2013.01); B21B 1/46 (2013.01); B21B 2015/0014 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 4104001 A1 19920813 - SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 064 (M - 285) 27 March 1984 (1984-03-27)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 218 (M - 503) 30 July 1986 (1986-07-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 302 (M - 1275) 3 July 1992 (1992-07-03)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19757486 A1 19990624; EP 0925850 A2 19990630; EP 0925850 A3 20021204

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-29 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981218

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI