Global Patent Index - EP 0925855 A3

EP 0925855 A3 2000-08-02 - Device for the controlled cooling from the rolling temperature of hot-rolled profiles, in particular beams

Title (en)

Device for the controlled cooling from the rolling temperature of hot-rolled profiles, in particular beams

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum kontrollierten Abkühlen von warmgewalzten Profilen, insbesondere Trägern, direkt aus der Walzhitze

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le refroidissement contrôlé de profilés laminés à chaud, en particulier de poutres, directement à partir de la température de laminage

Publication

EP 0925855 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124114 A

Priority

DE 19757485 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0925855A2] The installation is divided into cooling regions (1, 2, 3) located respectively above, below and on both sides of the rolled sections (5a, 5b, 6). The cooling regions are operable individually or in combination with one another. Each of the cooling regions has at least one coolant spray nozzle (7) or nozzle array. The nozzles are controllable either individually or as arrays.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 45/02; C21D 1/02; C21D 1/667

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 45/02 (2006.01); C21D 1/00 (2006.01); C21D 1/02 (2006.01); C21D 1/667 (2006.01); C21D 8/00 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 45/0215 (2013.01); C21D 1/02 (2013.01); C21D 1/667 (2013.01); C21D 9/0068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19757485 A1 19990624; EP 0925855 A2 19990630; EP 0925855 A3 20000802; JP H11254022 A 19990921; US 6170284 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020412

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21B 45/02 A, 7C 21D 1/667 B, 7C 21D 1/02 B

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981218

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI