Global patent index - EP 0925878 A3

EP 0925878 A3 2001-04-18 - Hand driven tool with torque limiting device

Title (en)

Hand driven tool with torque limiting device

Title (de)

Handbetätigtes Eindrehwerkzeug mit Drehmomentbegrenzungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Outil à main avec dispositif de limitation de couple

Publication

EP 0925878 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118301 A

Priority

DE 19756029 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0925878A2] The screw driver has a turning part (10) and a setting part, e.g. a setting screw (20). The screw has setting markings (24), which are visible from outside, and act with a setting scale (26) on the hand grip (14). The setting scale indicates the preset torques. The turning part is axially replaceable by other parts, because the torque limiter positively holds the replacement part with its holder part, in its axial position in the hand grip. The torques adjustable by the torque limited are below 10 Nm, especially between 5 and 6.5 Nm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/142

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/02 (2006.01); B25B 23/14 (2006.01); B25B 23/142 (2006.01); B25B 23/143 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/02 (2013.01); B25B 23/141 (2013.01); B25B 23/1427 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0925878 A2 19990630; EP 0925878 A3 20010418; DE 19756029 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021028

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI