Global Patent Index - EP 0925881 B1

EP 0925881 B1 2001-12-12 - Tool

Title (en)

Tool

Title (de)

Werkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil

Publication

EP 0925881 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811050 A

Priority

DE 19757271 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0925881A1] The tool has working (B), shaft (S), insertion (E), and impact zones. The core area of the shaft zone and/or the core area of the insertion zone is softer than the edge area of the zones. The hardness of the core areas is a maximum of 35 HRc, and the hardness of the edge areas is at least 50 HRc. The hardness of the working zone and/or the impact zone is at least 50 HRc. The working zone consists of a material different from that of the other zones, and is friction welded to the shaft zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/26 (2006.01); B25D 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19757271 A1 19990624; CN 1124918 C 20031022; CN 1220935 A 19990630; EP 0925881 A1 19990630; EP 0925881 B1 20011212; HU 221837 B1 20030128; HU 9802993 A2 19990628; HU 9802993 A3 20000428; HU 9802993 D0 19990201; JP H11245222 A 19990914

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091022

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091021

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-06-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802425 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991230

2000-03-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI