Global Patent Index - EP 0925889 A3

EP 0925889 A3 2000-03-15 - Transportable wood splitting machine

Title (en)

Transportable wood splitting machine

Title (de)

Transportable Holzspaltvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Machine de fendage de bois portative

Publication

EP 0925889 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98124193 A

Priority

IT VI970226 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0925889A2] A transportable wood splitting machine includes a supporting structure (100) having a wood block pusher (3) and a cutter (4) operated by a motor (10) through a worm screw and slider assembly (5,15). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27L 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27L 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0925889 A2 19990630; EP 0925889 A3 20000315; IT 1297525 B1 19991217; IT VI970226 A1 19990624; IT VI970226 D0 19971224

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-28 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1020908

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010701

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI