Global Patent Index - EP 0926061 B1

EP 0926061 B1 2002-11-27 - Ship-based arrangement for paying out a tow-cable for a self-propelled underwater watercraft

Title (en)

Ship-based arrangement for paying out a tow-cable for a self-propelled underwater watercraft

Title (de)

Schiffsgestützte Auslaufvorrichtung für ein Verbindungskabel zu einem eigengetriebenen Unterwasserfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif à bord d'un bateau pour mollir un câble de remorquage pour un véhicule sous-marine auto propulsé

Publication

EP 0926061 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98119960 A

Priority

DE 19750853 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19750853A1] A deflector device (19) guides the cable (14) over the edge of the deck of the surface vessel. The deflector device is positioned at the rear edge of the stern deck (101) and the cable is guided outwards from it in a stiff, streamlined protective tube, the mouth (202) of which is located beneath the propeller of the ship (18). The protective tube at its commencement (201) is so pivotably fixed in a vertically directed pivot plane that a pivot movement over the vertical to the propeller of the ship is blocked.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 21/66; B63C 11/48; B63G 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/66 (2006.01); B63C 11/42 (2006.01); B63G 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63G 7/02 (2013.01); B63B 21/66 (2013.01); B63C 11/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19750853 A1 19990602; DE 19750853 C2 20010816; EP 0926061 A2 19990630; EP 0926061 A3 20010905; EP 0926061 B1 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59806438

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161022

2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-09-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806438

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-05-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STN ATLAS ELEKTRONIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20111025

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20111013

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-04-02 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: THE REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE AS PROVIDED FOR IN ARTICLE 23 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 (SEE PUBLICATION IN HEADING XE OF THE PATENT BULLETIN OF 20060901/09) HAS BEEN GRANTED; THE RESTORATION OF THE PATENT HAS BEEN ENTERED IN THE PATENT REGISTER

2006-09-01 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: A REQUEST FOR RESTORATION TO THE PRIOR STATE (ARTICLE 23 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995) HAS BEEN FILED ON 20060703

2006-07-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2005-10-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-03-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ATLAS ELEKTRONIC GMBH

2003-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-10-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806438 20030109

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL PT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT NL PT

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011207

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63B 21/66 A, 7B 63C 11/48 B, 7B 63G 7/02 B

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI