Global Patent Index - EP 0926079 A3

EP 0926079 A3 2000-03-08 - Device for the packaging and transport of fluid or pulverulent products

Title (en)

Device for the packaging and transport of fluid or pulverulent products

Title (de)

Verpackungs- und Transportvorrichtung für Flüssigkeiten oder Schüttgütter

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le conditionnement et le transport de produits liquides ou en poudre

Publication

EP 0926079 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 98403243 A

Priority

FR 9716480 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0926079A2] The packaging comprises an internal container (1) containing the liquid or powder with a sealable emptying orifice (10). An external rigid shell (2) encloses the container. The shell is made in two parts (21,22) which are assembled in a removable manner and able to be locked. One of the parts (21) has a recess (20) which engages with the container emptying orifice to enable distribution of the product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0926079 A2 19990630; EP 0926079 A3 20000308; FR 2772730 A1 19990625; FR 2772730 B1 20000310

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011030

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: LV PAYMENT 20000908;RO PAYMENT 20000908;SI PAYMENT 20000908

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-04-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR THE PACKAGING AND TRANSPORT OF FLUID OR PULVERULENT PRODUCTS

2000-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR THE PACKAGING AND TRANSPORT OF FLUID OR PULVERULENT PRODUCTS

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR THE PACKAGING AND TRANSPORT OF FLUID OR PULVERULENT PRODUCTS

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI