Global Patent Index - EP 0926088 A3

EP 0926088 A3 2000-10-25 - Device for supporting reels, skeins or cakes of yarn in spooling machines

Title (en)

Device for supporting reels, skeins or cakes of yarn in spooling machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Halten von Spulen, Garnsträngen oder Garnkuchen in Wickelmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour supporter des bobines, écheveaux ou gâteaux de fils textiles dans les machines à bobiner

Publication

EP 0926088 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98830732 A

Priority

IT BS970102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0926088A2] This invention concerns a device for supporting yarn windings such as reels, skeins and cakes in spooling machines. It includes a horizontal elastic bar (12) fixed to overhang a support bracket (11) which is susceptible to elastic oscillations in a vertical direction, a vertical elastic component (13) connected to and hanging from this said elastic bar which is susceptible to omni-directional swinging oscillations and by a rotating spindle (14) connected to the bottom end of the said vertical elastic component destined to carry the winding. The horizontal elastic bar and the vertical elastic component move elastically in reaction to the forces applied to the spindle whilst this is being unwound. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 49/22; D01H 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/22 (2006.01); D01H 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/183 (2013.01); B65H 49/22 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0926088 A2 19990630; EP 0926088 A3 20001025; CZ 9804198 A3 19990714; HR P980626 A2 20000229; HU 9802968 A2 19990628; HU 9802968 A3 20000328; HU 9802968 D0 19990201; IT 1297333 B1 19990901; IT BS970102 A1 19990621; IT BS970102 D0 19971219; PL 330379 A1 19990621; RO 117091 B1 20011030; TR 9802634 A2 19991021; TR 9802634 A3 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030601

2001-11-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR LI PT

2001-08-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES LI

2001-07-18 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20010407;SI PAYMENT 20010407

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010407

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR LI PT

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI