Global Patent Index - EP 0926090 A3

EP 0926090 A3 2000-10-18 - Winding device and method of winding

Title (en)

Winding device and method of winding

Title (de)

Wickelvorrichtung und Wickelverfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de bobinage

Publication

EP 0926090 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309668 A

Priority

  • JP 33566597 A
  • JP 2751898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0926090A2] Wire (2) is fed from a spool (1) which is rotated by a feeding motor (3). Then the wire is led to a bobbin (7) on the tip of a spindle (6) via a pulley (12) on the tip of a tension arm (10) and a pulley (13) fixed on a rotational axis of an encoder (14). The rotational speed of the feeding motor (3) is controlled depending on winding speed of the wire (1) onto the bobbin (7) detected by the encoder (14). Furthermore, variations in the tension of the wire are detected by a potentiometer (11) as rotations of the tension arm (10). The rotational speed of the feeding motor (3) is regulated depending on such variations in tension. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 59/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/38 (2006.01); H01F 41/06 (2006.01); H02K 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/384 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01); B65H 2513/11 (2013.01); B65H 2515/31 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2513/11 + B65H 2220/02
  3. B65H 2515/31 + B65H 2220/01

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0926090 A2 19990630; EP 0926090 A3 20001018; JP H11222357 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981201

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI