Global Patent Index - EP 0926224 A3

EP 0926224 A3 2000-06-28 - Lubricating oil composition

Title (en)

Lubricating oil composition

Title (de)

Schmiermittelzusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition d'huile lubrifiante

Publication

EP 0926224 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98124661 A

Priority

JP 36720497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0926224A2] A lubricating oil composition for an automatic or continuously variable transmission, which comprises a lubricating base stock and 0.1 to 10 wt.%, based on the whole weight of the composition, of a compound composed of at least one of alkyl- or alkenyl-substituted cyclic dicarboxylic anhydrides. The composition can achieve a sufficient friction coefficient in a high sliding speed range in the automatic or continuously variable transmission.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 129/72; C10M 129/93; C10M 129/94

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 129/72 (2006.01); C10M 129/93 (2006.01); C10M 129/94 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 129/94 (2013.01); C10M 129/72 (2013.01); C10M 129/93 (2013.01); C10M 2207/123 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/14 (2013.01); C10M 2207/142 (2013.01); C10M 2207/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/04 (2013.01); C10N 2240/042 (2013.01); C10N 2240/044 (2013.01); C10N 2240/046 (2013.01); C10N 2240/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0926224 A2 19990630; EP 0926224 A3 20000628; JP H11181460 A 19990706

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100701

2005-09-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TONENGENERAL SEKIYU KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030213

2001-04-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-03-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-11 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000710

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 10M 129/72 A, 7C 10M 129/93 B, 7C 10M 129/94 B, 7C 10N 30:06 Z

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI