Global patent index - EP 0926286 A3

EP 0926286 A3 2000-05-24 - Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (en)

Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gestricks auf einer Flachstrickmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de tricot dans un métier à tricoter rectiligne

Publication

EP 0926286 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118629 A

Priority

DE 19756055 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0926286A2] To knit a fabric on a flatbed knitting machine, the slide speed (Vs) within a row of stitches is constant or controlled according to the separate needles or needle groups required for the knitting pattern or the characteristics of the knitting yarn. At each point, along the row of stitches, the slide is moved at the at the highest possible speed where the knitting yarn does not shear. At sections (S1,S3) within the knitted fabric, where there are no needle movements, the slide is moved at the maximum attainable speed (Vsmax). The slide speed (Vs) is reduced at points along the row of stitches where there is a mechanical switching with other assemblies. An Independent claim is also included for a flatbed knitting machine with a moving slide, which carries a lock. A control system for the slide drive sets the slide movement speeds according to the nature of the knitting yarn and the needles or needle groups used for the knitted pattern as a row of stitches is formed. The slide drive control is connected to the knitting pattern program memory.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 7/24 (2006.01); D04B 15/96 (2006.01); D04B 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/96 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756055 A1 19990624; EP 0926286 A2 19990630; EP 0926286 A3 20000524; EP 0926286 B1 20031210; ES 2207777 T3 20040601; JP 3092005 B2 20000925; JP H11269743 A 19991005; US 6105397 A 20000822

INPADOC legal status

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100917

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051003

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-10-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051003

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-10-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041015

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040928

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2207777

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810396

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020802

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI