Global Patent Index - EP 0926296 A3

EP 0926296 A3 2000-05-03 - Machine for making a paper web, in particular a tissue web

Title (en)

Machine for making a paper web, in particular a tissue web

Title (de)

Maschine zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn, insbesondere einer Tissue-Papierbahn

Title (fr)

Machine pour la fabrication d'une bande de papier, en particulier une bande de papier tissu

Publication

EP 0926296 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121245 A

Priority

DE 19756422 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2256108A1] Machine and process for producing a fiber material web that includes at least one press device having a shoe press unit and a drying drum, such that the shoe press unit and the drying drum are positioned to form an elongated press nip. The mach ine also includes at least one belt that is water-permeable and water-absorbent and that is adapted to guide the fiber material web through the press nip, and at least o ne suction device located ahead of the elongated press nip, relative to a belt trav el direction. The at least one belt is guided over the at least one suction device. The process includes guiding the at least one belt over the at least one suction dev ice and suctioning the at least one belt, such that moisture is removed from the at leas t one belt, and guiding the fiber material web and the suctioned at least one belt thr ough the extended press nip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 11/14; D21F 3/02; D21F 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21F 3/0281 (2013.01); D21F 11/14 (2013.01); D21F 11/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756422 A1 19990624; AT 270727 T 20040715; BR 9805673 A 19991207; CA 2256108 A1 19990618; CA 2256108 C 20070220; EP 0926296 A2 19990630; EP 0926296 A3 20000503; EP 0926296 B1 20040707; JP H11241288 A 19990907; US 6235160 B1 20010522

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-26 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59811653

2016-08-26 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59811653

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-28 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Document: DE 59811653

2015-07-28 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Document: DE 59811653

2010-06-23 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20100422

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2005-05-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AKTIEBOLAG

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-05-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AKTIEBOLAG

- Effective date: 20050323

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-10-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811653 P 20040812

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI GB IT SE

2004-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-19 [REG SE TRCL] SWEDISH TRANSLATION OF THE CLAIMS HAS BEEN FILED

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030324

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI GB IT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 21F 11/14 A, 7D 21F 3/02 B, 7D 21F 7/12 B

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI GB IT SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI