Global Patent Index - EP 0926343 A3

EP 0926343 A3 2000-05-10 - Refrigeration compressor muffler

Title (en)

Refrigeration compressor muffler

Title (de)

Schalldämpfer für einen Kältemittelkompressor

Title (fr)

Silencieux d'un compresseur pour fluides frigorigènes

Publication

EP 0926343 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124260 A

Priority

DE 19757829 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0926343A2] The coolant compressor takes the compressed coolant flow through an evaporation channel (50) from the pressure zone (30) in the outlet channel (42). An inlet opening (60) of the evaporation channel opens into the pressure zone with an abrupt cross section change. An outlet opening (54) of the evaporation channel opens into the outlet channel with an abrupt cross-section change. The cross section changes between the evaporation channel and the outlet channel and the pressure zone are at least by a factor of 5 or at least a factor of 10.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/0055 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0926343 A2 19990630; EP 0926343 A3 20000510; EP 0926343 B1 20150819; DE 19757829 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20160520

2016-05-20 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 59814555

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150819

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151221

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150819

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150819

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-01 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 59814555

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-09-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 744030

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150915

2015-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT PT SE

2015-08-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2015-06-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BITZER KUEHLMASCHINENBAU GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2015-03-25 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: INTG

- Effective date: 20150304

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041216

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041216

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE DK ES FR GB IT PT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT PT SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI