Global Patent Index - EP 0926345 A3

EP 0926345 A3 2000-03-08 - Shape of suction hole and discharge hole of refrigerant compressor

Title (en)

Shape of suction hole and discharge hole of refrigerant compressor

Title (de)

Formen der Ein- und Auslasslöcher eines Kühlverdichters

Title (fr)

Forme des passages d'aspiration et de refoulement pour compresseur de réfrigération

Publication

EP 0926345 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98124026 A

Priority

JP 36003797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0926345A2] Discharge holes and suction holes having shapes that suppress the turbulence of a refrigerant gas flow is disclosed. The shape of the discharge hole according to the present invention has a tapered surface wall, such that the circumference of the discharge hole increases from the piston cylinder surface to the discharge chamber surface. Similarly, the shape of the suction hole according to the present invention has a tapered surface wall such that the circumference of the suction hole increases from the suction chamber surface to the piston cylinder surface. The present invention allows the flow path of the refrigerant gas to flow approximately tangential to the valve reed by providing a tapered surface wall. The flow resistance of the discharge hole or the suction hole is reduced such that the volume efficiency of the compressor is improved and compressor noise is suppressed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 39/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/108 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0926345 A2 19990630; EP 0926345 A3 20000308; EP 0926345 B1 20011024; DE 69802160 D1 20011129; DE 69802160 T2 20020606

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69802160

2016-06-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SANDEN HOLDINGS CORPORATION, JP

- Effective date: 20160525

2016-04-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SANDEN HOLDINGS CORPORATION, LSESAKI-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANDEN CORP., ISESAKI, GUNMA, JP

- Document: DE 69802160

2016-04-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69802160

- Representative's name: PRUEFER & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANW, DE

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802160 20011129

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI