Global Patent Index - EP 0926433 A3

EP 0926433 A3 2001-03-07 - Lamp

Title (en)

Lamp

Title (de)

Leuchte

Title (fr)

Lampe

Publication

EP 0926433 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123509 A

Priority

DE 19755701 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0926433A2] The light has a plastic housing and a plastic attachment element (2) with a first connecting section with a first connecting element (5) and pref. a third connecting element, whereby the first connecting element is a rotary connecting element. The housing has a first end section (3) and a second end section (4), each with a second rotary connecting element (6). The first connecting element can be optionally connected to the second connecting element of the first or second end section. An independent claim is also included for packing for producing a usable light.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/00; F21V 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/00 (2006.01); F21V 21/112 (2006.01); F21V 21/116 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/00 (2013.01); F21S 8/032 (2013.01); F21S 8/036 (2013.01); F21S 8/061 (2013.01); F21V 21/112 (2013.01); F21V 21/116 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19755701 A1 19990624; EP 0926433 A2 19990630; EP 0926433 A3 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-07-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI PT

2002-04-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI PT

2002-01-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GR IT LI PT

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES FR GR IT LI PT

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEUSS S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21V 21/00 A, 7F 21V 21/10 B

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI PT

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI