Global Patent Index - EP 0926631 A3

EP 0926631 A3 2000-09-06 - Measurement of paper speed using laser speckle detection

Title (en)

Measurement of paper speed using laser speckle detection

Title (de)

Messung der Papiergeschwindigkeit mittels Detektion von Laser-Speckle

Title (fr)

Mesurage de la vitesse du papier utilisant la détection de la granulation produite par laser

Publication

EP 0926631 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98123824 A

Priority

  • US 6843497 P
  • US 2345798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0926631A2] In a postage printing device, a printer is employed to print postage indicia on mail pieces. The printer is preferably a noncontact printer such as an ink-jet printer. Printing occurs as the mail piece moves relative to the print head of the printer, which requires that reliable motion information (e.g. a print clock signal) be made available to the electronics driving the print head. The reliable motion is provided in a noncontact way, preferably by directing a laser beam toward the mail piece and detecting a moving speckle pattern in the light scattered from the mail piece. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 11/42 (2006.01); B41J 13/12 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00661 (2013.01); B41J 11/008 (2013.01); B41J 11/42 (2013.01); B41J 13/12 (2013.01); G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00532 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00669 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00693 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0926631 A2 19990630; EP 0926631 A3 20000906; CA 2256237 A1 19990621; CA 2256237 C 20080212

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20120726

2008-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080703

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI