Global Patent Index - EP 0926649 A3

EP 0926649 A3 2000-07-19 - Device signalling the arrival of rescue teams

Title (en)

Device signalling the arrival of rescue teams

Title (de)

Signalvorrichtung des Ankunft der Hilfemittel

Title (fr)

Dispositif de signalisation de l'arrivée des équipes de secours

Publication

EP 0926649 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98830769 A

Priority

IT MI970920 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0926649A2] Electronic device signalling the arrival of rescue teams including: A transmitter installed on rescue vehicles which emits a coded signal during the time in which audio-visual devices have been activated; A receiver which, since it receives the coded signal transmitted by the transmitter installed on rescue vehicles, signals to the driver of the vehicle on which the receiver has been installed, by using an audio and/or visual device, the imminent arrival of a rescue team.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/0965

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/0965 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/0965 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[XA] US 5307060 A 19940426 - PREVULSKY SY [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0926649 A2 19990630; EP 0926649 A3 20000719; IT 238138 Y1 20000929; IT MI970920 U1 19990623

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI