Global Patent Index - EP 0926767 A3

EP 0926767 A3 2001-05-02 - Improved female terminal

Title (en)

Improved female terminal

Title (de)

Verbessertes weibliches Endstück

Title (fr)

Contact femelle amélioré

Publication

EP 0926767 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98500264 A

Priority

ES 9703264 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0926767A2] The proposed terminal is formed with a noticeably prismatic body in the interior of which are provided contact plates double elbowed rising from the walls or vertical faces forming that portion of the prismatic zone. In the other two faces are provided embossings acting as retention elements once introduced the terminal in the interior of the connector's cavity. As is a known form, in the initial portion of the terminal are provided with elbowed surface bases that are narrowed and enlarged provided with the corresponding wings which by a setting operation estabilish the contact between the terminal and the conductive portion of the conductive wire once naked of its sheat. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/115

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/114 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0926767 A2 19990630; EP 0926767 A3 20010502; ES 1039053 U 19981001; ES 1039053 Y 19990316; WO 9931764 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030616

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI