Global Patent Index - EP 0926958 B1

EP 0926958 B1 2000-12-20 - HANDLING INSTALLATION, IN PARTICULAR FOR CIGARETTES

Title (en)

HANDLING INSTALLATION, IN PARTICULAR FOR CIGARETTES

Title (de)

ANLAGE ZUM HANDHABEN VON INSBESONDERE ZIGARETTEN

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE MANIPULATION, NOTAMMENT DE CIGARETTES

Publication

EP 0926958 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97919013 A

Priority

  • DE 19635598 A
  • EP 9704731 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19635598A1] A handling installation is disclosed, in particular for cigarettes. Known installations for handling cigarettes have a reservoir for temporarily storing the cigarettes, a maker (10) for the cigarettes and a packer (11). The maker (10) is arranged upstream of the reservoir (12) and the packer (11) is arranged downstream of the reservoir (12). In known installations, synchronising the action between reservoir (12), packer (11) and maker (10) causes problems. In the disclosed installation, the working speed of the maker (10) and packer (11) is controlled depending on a measured filling level of the reservoir (12). When the filling level of the reservoir (12) is low, the working speed of the maker (10) is increased, when the filling level is high, said speed is decreased. On the contrary, the working speed of the packer (11) is increased when the filling level is high but reduced when the filling level is low.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/35; B65G 47/51

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/35 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/35 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19635598 A1 19980305; BR 9711651 A 19990824; CN 1084169 C 20020508; CN 1228680 A 19990915; EP 0926958 A1 19990707; EP 0926958 B1 20001220; JP 2000517190 A 20001226; JP 3307954 B2 20020729; US 6193051 B1 20010227; WO 9809543 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702791

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140930

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130901

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130901

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130901

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120913

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120829

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091012

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702791 20010125

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991022

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990202

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT