Global Patent Index - EP 0926967 B1

EP 0926967 B1 2000-04-19 - CANTILEVER TYPE SHELF

Title (en)

CANTILEVER TYPE SHELF

Title (de)

KRAGARMREGAL

Title (fr)

RAYONNAGE A BRAS EN PORTE-A-FAUX

Publication

EP 0926967 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97909243 A

Priority

  • DE 29616189 U
  • EP 9704943 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: MY121666A] IN A CANTILEVER-BRACKET SHELF UNIT FOR LENGTHY PRODUCTS, SUCH AS BOARDS, PIPES, IRON SECTIONS AND THE LIKE, INCLUDING UPRIGHTS AND CANTILEVER BRACKETS EXTENDING OUT THEREFROM, WHEREIN THE UPRIGHTS ARE CONSTRUCTED AS T -SECTION UPRIGHTS AND CUT-OUTS (3) ARE DISPOSED IN THE FLANGES (2) THEREOF IN SPACED PAIRS WHICH ARE LOCATED ONE ABOVE THE OTHER AT THE SAME PITCH AND WHEREIN TWO HOOKS (5) ARE PROVIDED AS RETAINING ELEMENTS AT THE END OF EACH CANTILEVER BRACKET (4) FOR RELEASABLY HANGING THE BRACKETS IN THE CUT-OUTS (3), MAXIMUM LOAD BEARING CAPACITY AND LIKEWISE TROUBLE-FREE MANUFACTURE AND SIMPLE ASSEMBLY AND DISPLACEMENT OR ADJUSTMENT OF THE CANTILEVER- BRACKETS SO THAT THEY EXTEND UNIFORMLY BELOW ONE ANOTHER IN A PLANE IS ACHIEVED IN THAT, THE HOOKS (5) ARE INSERTABLE HORIZONTALLY AT REGIONS THEREOF THROUGH THE CUT-OUTS (3) AND THAT AN OPENING (8) IS PRESENT IN THE INSERTABLE REGION (6) OF EACH HOOK (5), SAID OPENING (8) BEING DESIGNED TO RECEIVE A SECURING ELEMENT (20) IN A HORIZONTAL DIRECTION. PREFERABLY, THE SECURING ELEMENTS (20) ARE DESIGNED IN THE FORM OF SECURING HOOKS (21) FOR TRANSFERRING THRUST.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 57/52; B65G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/40 (2006.01); A47B 57/48 (2006.01); A47B 81/00 (2006.01); B65G 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/482 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 3832537 A1 19900329 - HOELSCHER OTTOKAR [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29616189 U1 19961031; AT 191835 T 20000515; AU 4701897 A 19980414; BR 9711487 A 20000118; DK 0926967 T3 20000904; EP 0926967 A1 19990707; EP 0926967 B1 20000419; ES 2146987 T3 20000816; GR 3033458 T3 20000929; JP 2001503001 A 20010306; MY 121666 A 20060228; PL 184345 B1 20021031; PL 332234 A1 19990830; PT 926967 E 20001031; US 6129224 A 20001010; WO 9811804 A1 19980326

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160804

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-09-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146987 T3

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701483 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191835 T 20000515

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990922

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990308

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE