Global Patent Index - EP 0926970 B1

EP 0926970 B1 2001-02-14 - SPRUNG CROSS SLATS FOR BED BASE

Title (en)

SPRUNG CROSS SLATS FOR BED BASE

Title (de)

FEDERBRÜCKE FÜR EINE UNTERMATRATZE

Title (fr)

LAME SOUPLE POUR SOMMIER

Publication

EP 0926970 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96929161 A

Priority

  • CH 9600320 W
  • CH 83495 A
  • US 24237399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2001014984A1] The spring bridge (2) comprises a main, load-bearing bridge (6), which can be fitted in the frame of a mattress base, and one or more supporting elements (8) arranged thereon. The supporting elements (8) extend, preferably in the form of a sheet-like, wing-like lip, from the main, load-bearing bridge (6), in the lateral direction, transversely with respect to the longitudinal axis of the main, load-bearing bridge and project beyond the top side of the main, load-bearing bridge (6). They are designed such that their flexibility in relation to the main, load-bearing bridge counter to a bearing force, usually the locally active weight of a mattress which has been positioned on top and of a person who is resting on said mattress, is more yielding than the flexibility of the main, load-bearing bridge itself. The spring-bridge construction proposed, on the one hand, permits cost-effective production of a spring-bridge grille and, on the other hand, nevertheless provides the functions which are necessary for a high degree of lying comfort, in particular locally progressively adapting spring properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/02 (2006.01); A47C 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK ES FI GB IT LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 2001014984 A1 20010823; AT 195229 T 20000815; CN 1101168 C 20030212; CN 1229344 A 19990922; DE 59605692 D1 20000914; DK 0926970 T3 20010605; EP 0733325 A1 19960925; EP 0733325 B1 20000809; EP 0926970 A1 19990707; EP 0926970 B1 20010214; ES 2153974 T3 20010316; HK 1021881 A1 20030801; JP 2001500757 A 20010123; JP 3792729 B2 20060705; PT 926970 E 20010830; US 6256815 B1 20010710; WO 9811807 A1 19980326

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160918

2016-12-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161227

2016-09-21 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160916

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150916

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140917

2015-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150317

2015-03-25 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150317

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120917

2013-06-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120917

2013-04-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120918

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-04-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153974 T3

2001-03-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010215

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK ES FI GB IT LU NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000525

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990205

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DK ES FI GB IT LU NL PT SE