Global Patent Index - EP 0927035 A4

EP 0927035 A4 2002-11-13 - THROMBIN INHIBITORS

Title (en)

THROMBIN INHIBITORS

Title (de)

THROMBIN INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE THROMBINE

Publication

EP 0927035 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97942415 A

Priority

  • GB 9624278 A
  • US 9715989 W
  • US 2603396 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9810763A1] A compound which inhibits human thrombin and which has general structure (I) such as formula (a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/44; A61K 31/155; A61K 31/495; C07C 257/18; C07D 213/06; C07D 213/12; C07D 213/30; C07D 213/73; C07D 213/74; C07D 241/04; C07D 295/22; C07D 405/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 295/22 (2006.01); A61K 31/155 (2006.01); A61K 31/4409 (2006.01); A61K 31/443 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); C07C 257/18 (2006.01); C07D 213/16 (2006.01); C07D 213/30 (2006.01); C07D 213/73 (2006.01); C07D 213/74 (2006.01); C07D 295/26 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/73 (2013.01); C07C 257/18 (2013.01); C07D 213/74 (2013.01); C07D 295/26 (2013.01); C07D 405/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0718286 A1 19960626 - SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]
  • [X] EP 0524781 A1 19930127 - ICI PLC [GB]
  • [X] EP 0302792 A2 19890208 - SANOFI SA [FR], et al
  • [X] WO 9626196 A2 19960829 - SCHERING CORP [US]
  • [PX] WO 9805644 A1 19980212 - UNIV GRANADA [ES], et al
  • [A] WO 9420467 A1 19940915 - BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al
  • [X] EFANGE ET AL: "Flexible N-Methyl-4-phenyl-1,2,3,6-tetrahydropyridine Analogues: Synthesis Monamine Oxidase Catalyzed Bioactivation", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, vol. 33, no. 12, 1990, pages 3133 - 3142, XP002119483, ISSN: 0022-2623
  • [X] DATABASE CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE; 27 June 1988 (1988-06-27), XP002213631 & J. PRAKT. CHEM., vol. 325, no. 2, 1983, pages 301 - 308J. PRAKT. CHEM.19833252301308
  • [X] JAIN ET AL: "Chemical and pharmacological investigations of some.omega.-substituted alkylamino-3-aminopyridines", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, vol. 11, no. 1, 1968, pages 87 - 92, XP002093777, ISSN: 0022-2623
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 197734, Derwent World Patents Index; Class C02, AN 1977-60361Y, XP002213632
  • [X] PROTIVA M ET AL: "1-ARYL- AND 1-(ARYLMETHYL)-4-GUANYLPIPERAZINES AND OTHER HETEROCYCLIC AND ALICYCLIC GUANIDINE DERIVATIVES", COLLECTION OF CZECHOSLOVAK CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, vol. 40, 1975, pages 3904 - 3923, XP000574972, ISSN: 0010-0765
  • [X] WALKER G N ET AL: "APPLICATION OF SODIUM BOROHYDRIDE, REDUCTION TO SYNTHESIS OF SUBSTITUTED AMINOPIPERIDINES, AMINOPIPERAZINES, AMINOPYRIDINES AND HYDRAZINES", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, vol. 26, no. 8, 14 August 1961 (1961-08-14), pages 2740 - 2747, XP002071843, ISSN: 0022-3263
  • [A] MAO S-S: "FACTOR XA INHIBITORS", PERSPECTIVES IN DRUG DISCOVERY AND DESIGN, ESCOM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, XX, vol. 1, no. 3, 1993, pages 423 - 430, XP000654087, ISSN: 0928-2866
  • See also references of WO 9810763A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9810763 A1 19980319; AU 4411797 A 19980402; AU 725403 B2 20001012; CA 2264037 A1 19980319; EP 0927035 A1 19990707; EP 0927035 A4 20021113; JP 2001500864 A 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2002-11-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/44 A, 7A 61K 31/155 B, 7A 61K 31/495 B, 7C 07C 257/18 B, 7C 07D 213/12 B, 7C 07D 241/04 B, 7C 07D 213/06 B, 7C 07D 213/30 B, 7C 07D 213/73 B, 7C 07D 213/74 B, 7C 07D 295/22 B, 7C 07D 405/12 B

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990413

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE