EP 0927038 A4 20000726 - P1, P4-DITHIO-P2,P3-MONOCHLOROMETHYLENE 5', 5'''-DIADENOSINE P1, P4-TETRAPHOSPHATE AS ANTITHROMBOTIC AGENT
Title (en)
P1, P4-DITHIO-P2,P3-MONOCHLOROMETHYLENE 5', 5'''-DIADENOSINE P1, P4-TETRAPHOSPHATE AS ANTITHROMBOTIC AGENT
Title (de)
P1, P4-DITHIO-P2,P3-MONOCHLOROMETHYLEN 5',5'''-DIADENOSIN-P1,P4-TETRAPHOSPHAT VERWENDET ALS ANTI-THROMBOSE MITTEL
Title (fr)
P1,P4-DITHIO-P2,P3-MONOCHLOROMETHYLENE-5',5'''-DIADENOSINE-P1,P4-TETRAPHOSPHATE UTILISE COMME AGENT ANTI-THROMBOSE
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 9707377 W 19970501
- US 64302996 A 19960502
Abstract (en)
[origin: US5681823A] A novel composition, P1, P4-dithio-P2, P3-monochloromethylene 5', 5'''-diadenosine P1, P4-tetraphosphate, is disclosed. The composition is useful as a therapeutic agent for prevention of thrombosis and for modulating a thrombolytic effect in a mammal.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
C07H 21/02 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7084 (2006.01); A61K 38/49 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
A61K 31/7048 (2013.01 - EP US); A61P 7/00 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 7/02 (2017.12 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [A] B.K.KIM ET AL.: "Antithrombotic Effect of B,B'-Monochloromethylene Diadenosine 5',5'''-P1,P4-tetraphosphate.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., vol. 89, no. 22, 15 November 1992 (1992-11-15), NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON., US, pages 11056 - 11058, XP002138187, ISSN: 0027-8424
- [A] P.C.ZAMECNIK ET AL.: "Analogues of Diadenosine 5',5'''-P1,P4-tetraphosphate (Ap4A) as Potential Antiplatelet Aggregation Agents.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., vol. 89, no. 6, 15 March 1992 (1992-03-15), NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON., US, pages 2370 - 2373, XP002138188, ISSN: 0027-8424
- [PX] S.W.CHAN ET AL.: "P1,P4-dithio-P2,P3-monochloromethylene 5',5'''-diadenosine P1,P4-tetraphosphate : A novel antiplatelet agent.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA., vol. 94, no. 8, April 1997 (1997-04-01), NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON., US, pages 4034 - 4039, XP002080574, ISSN: 0027-8424
- See references of WO 9740840A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
CH DE FR GB LI
DOCDB simple family (publication)
US 5681823 A 19971028; AU 2823097 A 19971119; CA 2252862 A1 19971106; CN 1112930 C 20030702; CN 1220606 A 19990623; DE 69711649 D1 20020508; DE 69711649 T2 20020808; EP 0927038 A1 19990707; EP 0927038 A4 20000726; EP 0927038 B1 20020403; JP 2000509397 A 20000725; JP 4212114 B2 20090121; WO 9740840 A1 19971106
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 64302996 A 19960502; AU 2823097 A 19970501; CA 2252862 A 19970501; CN 97195060 A 19970501; DE 69711649 T 19970501; EP 97922603 A 19970501; JP 53923597 A 19970501; US 9707377 W 19970501