Global Patent Index - EP 0927321 B1

EP 0927321 B1 2000-05-17 - PRE-VAPORIZING AND PRE-MIXING BURNER FOR LIQUID FUELS

Title (en)

PRE-VAPORIZING AND PRE-MIXING BURNER FOR LIQUID FUELS

Title (de)

VORVERDAMPFENDER UND VORVERMISCHENDER BRENNER FÜR FLÜSSIGE BRENNSTOFFE

Title (fr)

BRULEUR DE PREVAPORISATION ET DE PREMELANGE POUR COMBUSTIBLES LIQUIDES

Publication

EP 0927321 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97937567 A

Priority

  • DE 19637025 A
  • EP 9704374 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19637025A1] The invention concerns a pre-vaporizing and pre-mixing burner for liquid fuels which has a fuel feed line (56), a pump which pressurizes the fuel in the feed line, a mixing region (123) and a fuel valve (119) which opens out into the mixing region and by means of which the fuel is atomized and fed to the air for combustion (127). According to the invention, the fuel is vaporized in an optimum manner in that the fuel valve opens automatically as from a given fuel pressure, and a heating device (128) is associated with the fuel valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23K 5/20; F23D 11/44; F23K 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/24 (2006.01); F23D 11/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/448 (2013.01); F23D 11/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH ES FR GB GR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19637025 A1 19980319; AT 193119 T 20000615; CZ 9900798 A3 19991013; EP 0927321 A1 19990707; EP 0927321 B1 20000517; ES 2151292 T3 20001216; GR 3033431 T3 20000929; HU 9904179 A2 20000428; HU 9904179 A3 20001228; NO 991002 A 19990302; NO 991002 D0 19990302; PL 187189 B1 20040531; PL 332318 A1 19990830; US 6350116 B1 20020226; WO 9811386 A1 19980319

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070812

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HERRMANN STEPHAN

- Effective date: 20070831

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050813

2006-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060829

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050812

2006-03-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060302

2005-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050813

2005-08-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050812

2005-08-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050812

2004-08-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040827

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040826

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040715

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151292 T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARDIN & CIE S.A.

2000-05-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB GR IT LI

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193119 T 20000615

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990810

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990209

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB GR IT LI